THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CUTLERS GENERAL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty; the advancement of education; the advancement of religion; the equipping of hospices with cutlery; and other purposes beneficial to the community. Preference is given to charities that serve London, especially those that benefit deprived inner London boroughs. Grants are not normally awarded to charities that attract national support, or those outside the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of London
Governance
- 29 September 1981: Standard registration
- 23 July 2024: Funds received from 278009 THE CUTLERS SURGICAL AWARD FUND
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Charles Fisher | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Burger | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Ian Sabin FRCS | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL POCOCK | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.73k | £143.21k | £158.69k | £145.09k | £433.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.10k | £133.03k | £99.24k | £135.54k | £160.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 21ST JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF CUTLERS
CUTLERS HALL
4 WARWICK LANE
LONDON
EC4M 7BR
- Phone:
- 02072481866
- Email:
- clerk@cutlerslondon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window