Financial history THE QUEEN'S SCHOOL PARENTS AND STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 283103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.19k £23.46k £28.15k £27.19k £28.59k
Total expenditure £14.40k £67.86k £40.17k £36.32k £29.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A