THE ASHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre caters for such organisations as Scouts & Guides,Youth Clubs,Bowling,Playgroup,Garden Club, W.I., Golden Link,Gymnastics, Yoga, Badminton etc. as well as social events such as parties, concerts, Bingo etc. We try to provide facilities and opportunities for all age groups to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Colley | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BECKETT | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BOLTON | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA BINNS | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Rix | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MCNEAL | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ready Mrs | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH COLLINS | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE BOLTON | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Eves | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Sangster | Trustee | 01 April 1981 |
|
|
||||
JANET EVELYN OXBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.24k | £15.11k | £2.74k | £14.01k | £20.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.84k | £8.35k | £7.42k | £19.01k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 17TH JULY 1981
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ASHILL IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE CIVIL PARISH OF ASHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waterend Farm
Water End
Great Cressingham
THETFORD
Norfolk
IP25 6NN
- Phone:
- 01760441057
- Email:
- ashillcctreasurer@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window