Trustees THE ASHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 283109

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Colley | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BECKETT | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BOLTON | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA BINNS | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Rix | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MCNEAL | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ready Mrs | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH COLLINS | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE BOLTON | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Eves | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Sangster | Trustee | 01 April 1981 |
|
|
||||
JANET EVELYN OXBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.