LADS OF THE VILLAGE LODGE NO 9334 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 283139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support Charities both within our Order, and outside organisations. We also support members in neccisitous circumstances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £625
Total expenditure: £998

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 September 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN QUALEY Trustee 31 March 2017
ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E NORTH KENT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
RAYMOND TODD Trustee 01 January 1989
ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E NORTH KENT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
BENEVOLENT FUND OF SIR JAMES ORD HUME LODGE NO 3331 OF THE ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Adolphus grazette Trustee
BENEVOLENT FUND OF SIR JAMES ORD HUME LODGE NO 3331 OF THE ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES G L E NORTH KENT PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
NEWHAM AFRICAN CARIBBEAN CENTRE
Received: 5 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.48k £550 £636 £758 £625
Total expenditure £1.81k £808 £655 £476 £998
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 January 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 Springfield Road
East Ham
London
E6 2AH
Phone:
07492111755
Website:

No information available