THE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote awareness and understanding of intellectual property law, and its contribution to economic and social welfare, through high quality, independent research. We aim to provide knowledge and expertise for industry, policy makers, professionals and the general public, in order to foster a legal, social and regulatory climate that supports an innovation-based economy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- India
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 30 September 1981: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- I P INSTITUTE (Working name)
- IP INSTITUTE (Working name)
- IPI (Working name)
- THE COMMON LAW INSTITUTE OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.12k | £179.21k | £161.73k | £123.58k | £198.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.82k | £176.66k | £199.93k | £62.05k | £214.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 07 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 07 December 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND APRIL 1981, AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 22ND JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND RESEARCH INTO THE LANDS RELATING TO INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY RIGHTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN COUNTIRES WHOSE LEGAL SYSTEMS ARE BASED UPON COMMON LAW AND THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONSEQUENCES OF THE APPLICATION OF SUCH LAWS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window