G A HOBSON SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 283203
Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes with emphasis on cancer and other medical research organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GERALD AUBREY HOBSON Chair
None on record
MARIA EMILINDA HOBSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £600 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CEDARS
HIGH STREET
HOPTON
DISS
IP22 2QX
Phone:
01953681268
Website:

No information available