Financial history THE TWIL GROUP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283212
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £9.65k £9.66k £60 £13 £9
Total expenditure £8.58k £3.44k £1.60k £1.43k £6.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A