FRIENDS OF MIDHURST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND RIVERBANK MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purchase of equipment and other items for use in the Community Hospital. Contribution towards the upkeep of the gardens at the Community Hospital. Contributions to Christmas funds for the benefit of the patients and staff at the Community Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 October 1981: Standard registration
- The Friends of Midhurst Community Hospital (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF MIDHURST COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MIDHURST COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MIDHURST, EASEBOURNE AND DISTRICT COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Mellings | Chair | 20 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Susan Mary Walchli | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Philip John Watts | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
SIAN WYN MITCHELL | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|||||||
ROGER CHARLES BRICKNELL | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH WILLING | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DOCTOR HUGH HORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GEORGE MARCHAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH MARCHAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Alain Mardle | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £841 | £10.21k | £16.67k | £3.18k | £903 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.34k | £45.27k | £35.24k | £30.89k | £133.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND RULES ADOPTED 29TH MAY 1957 AS AMENDED 4TH AUGUST 1981 AND 21ST JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO SUPPORT AND REVIEVE PATIENTS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND THE MEDICAL CENTRE. (B) TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND RIVERBANK MEDICAL CENTRE BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE AND TO PROVIDE A LINK OR SUPPORT BETWEEN THEM AND THE COMMUNITY. (C) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FRIENDS THINK FIT THE RESOURSES OF THE HOSPITAL AND THE RIVERBANK MEDICAL CENTRE. (D) TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS OR ORGANISATION WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, DONATION OR OTHERWISE. (E) TO TAKE AND ACCEPT GIFT OF PROPERTY WHETHER SUBJECT TO ANY SPECIAL TRUST OR NOT. (F) TO PROMOTE MEDICAL CARE AND ANCILLARY WELFARE AND COMFORT IN THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, BUILDINGS AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Guillards Oak
Midhurst
GU29 9JZ
- Phone:
- 01730814473
- Email:
- rbricknell@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window