Financial history THE SPRINGWOOD HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 283218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.39k £1.48k £5.07k £7.04k £15.18k
Total expenditure £3.27k £11.07k £17.06k £8.86k £13.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A