THE SUZY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to relieve suffering and starvation in third world countries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 September 1981: Standard registration
- ST PETER & ST PAULS SUZY FUND (Working name)
- THE SUZY FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marianne Magdy Haworth | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ciara Ellen Metcalfe | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Bernard Hazell | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monica Haley | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Terry Patrick Walsh | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Satya Bhushan Mehta | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.35k | £16.17k | £21.49k | £14.15k | £67.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.07k | £16.62k | £21.37k | £17.72k | £33.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH JANUARY 1980 as amended on 24 Jun 2019 as amended on 24 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE RELIEF OF REFUGEES FROM AND THE POOR OF ALL NATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Chevet Mews
Sandal
WAKEFIELD
West Yorkshire
WF2 6AG
- Phone:
- 07801 043111
- Email:
- christianhazell@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window