Accounts and annual returns THE MASON BIBBY 1981 TRUST

Charity number: 283231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window