THE MASON BIBBY 1981 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need amongst UK employees or ex-employees of J Bibby & Sons plc (now Barloworld plc) including subsidiary companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDSAY FRANCES STEAD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mason Bibby 1981 Trust | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.53k | £77.58k | £100.99k | £136.19k | £111.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.69k | £74.51k | £73.40k | £123.02k | £93.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH JULY 1981
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF FOREGOING IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST EMPLOYEES AND EX-EMPLOYEES OF J BIBBY & SONS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OR RELATIVES AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PATRON SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mason Bibby 1981 Trust
c/o Mrs D Fahy
2 Farm Crescent
St. Albans
Hertfordshire
AL2 1UQ
- Phone:
- 07721 422687
- Email:
- masonbibbytrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window