EARL OF CHICHESTER'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the work of charities, voluntary organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY ELIZA CATHERINE CONWAY | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
THE RT HON JOHN NICHOLAS PELHAM THE EARL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE RT HON JUNE MARIJKE THE COUNTESS OF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.84k | £84.28k | £32.14k | £61.70k | £91.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.16k | £57.78k | £33.27k | £35.29k | £39.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 JANUARY 1966
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVELYN PARTNERS
21 CHIPPER LANE
SALISBURY
SP1 1BG
- Phone:
- 01722411881
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window