Financial history CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND SAFETY GROUP

Charity number: 283249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £294.79k £483.68k £502.33k £628.49k £700.13k
Total expenditure £492.71k £563.93k £637.89k £649.57k £687.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £476.69k £530.52k £674.33k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £25.64k £25.26k £25.80k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £72.71k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £637.89k £649.57k £687.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0