THE PENNINGTON MELLOR MUNTHE CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity trust's objects are to protect and maintain, in perpetuity, two houses of historic interest - Southside House, Wimbledon and Hellens, Much Marcle and to make both houses available for educational and cultural activities to the local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£9,921,654
Donations and legacies | £1.97k | |
Charitable activities | £162.91k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £594.68k | |
Other | £9.16m |
Total expenditure:
£1,021,493
Raising funds | £99.61k | |
Charitable activities | £921.89k | |
Other | £0 |
-£88,763 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £99.61k | |
Charitable expenditure | £921.89k | |
Retained for future use | £8.90m |
People

11 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
- Merton
Governance
- 24 September 1981: Standard registration
- PENNINGTON MELLOR MUNTHE CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- THE PENNINGTON MELLOR CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW KEAN | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Patrick McIlroy | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sandra Romito | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
GABRIEL ALEXANDER MICHAEL WALSH | Trustee | 07 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Adam John Axel Russell Munthe | Trustee | 01 January 1997 |
|
|||||||||
MARTIN DRURY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JOHN FREDERICK HARKNESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Turi Benjamin Munthe | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PETER HENRY CHARLES RICHEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Dr LINDSAY RAYMONDE CLIFFORD STAINTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
TOBIAS AXEL MUNTHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
EDWARD HENRY BONHAM-CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £573.97k | £549.23k | £652.72k | £636.19k | £9.92m | |
|
Total expenditure | £490.03k | £571.88k | £649.03k | £860.25k | £1.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.92k | £62.49k | £12.40k | £8.71k | £1.97k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £87.03k | £11.45k | £80.59k | £95.06k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £48.15k | £49.65k | £124.24k | £95.97k | £162.91k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £12.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £436.88k | £425.63k | £435.50k | £435.81k | £594.68k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £650 | £9.16m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £439.97k | £532.52k | £564.82k | £761.84k | £921.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £50.06k | £39.35k | £84.21k | £98.42k | £99.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £74.13k | £58.11k | £74.06k | £290.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £25.42k | £24.12k | £26.70k | £24.89k | £47.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.39m | £3.38m | £3.38m | £3.39m | £3.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.47m | £8.15m | £8.54m | £8.00m | £15.87m | |
|
Other assets | £44.13k | £102.29k | £59.46k | £426.16k | £93.28k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £32.58k | £49.92k | £58.62k | £991.34k | £57.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 21 AUGUST 1981 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 17 OCTOBER 1989, AS AMENDED BY VARIATION OF SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1996 AND SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 19 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF HELLEN'S MUCH MARCLE AND THE CONTENTS THEREOF, ALONQ WITH SUCH OF THE FORMER CONTENTS OF SOUTHSIDE HOUSE, WIMBLEDON, BEING OF SIGNIFICANT ARTISTIC AND/OR HISTORIC VALUE, AS MAY REASONABLY BE ACCOMMODATED AND DISPLAYED AT HELLENS MUCH MARCLE; AND (B) THE USE OF THE SAID PROPERTY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS WHICH ARE COMPATIBLE WITH MAINTENANCE OF THE PROPERTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN KEEPING WITH ITS HISTORIC NATURE.
Area of benefit
HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 EARLS WALK
LONDON
W8 6EP
- Phone:
- 02079370415
- Email:
- info@pmmct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window