WESTLEY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 September 1981: Standard registration
- 19 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WESTLEY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WESTLEY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHERS HOME/SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.42k | £4.52k | £2.96k | £3.24k | £9.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.48k | £781 | £425 | £2.82k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AND AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window