SAMPFORD COURTENAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BIG BREAKFAST, COME BUY AND CHATS, TALKS, DOG SHOW AND CAR BOOT SALE, SUMMER EVENT, QUIZ, FILMS, MUSICAL EVENINGS, PRIVATE PARTIES AND WEDDING RECEPTIONS. WE TRY TO HAVE A VARIED PROGRAMME OF EVENTS AND TO HAVE SOMETHING FOR EVERYONE IN THE VILLAGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 30 September 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Leslie Hedger | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julieann Evans | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Crisp | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marion Susan Pratt | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lawrence Biddlecombe | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Evans | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Chidwick | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Townsend Green | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Robinson | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rory George Robinson | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert George Tucker | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joy Christine Tucker | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Courage | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY RUPERT JONATHAN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2020 | 23/10/2021 | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | 23/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £36.96k | £88.46k | £105.22k | £10.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £23.01k | £82.14k | £101.93k | £28.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £21.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 23 October 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF SAMPFORD COURTENAY AND HONEYCHURCH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF SAMPFORD COURTENAY AND HONEYCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southey Farm
Southey Lane
Sampford Courtenay
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 2TE
- Phone:
- 07971020379
- Email:
- andrew.tgreen@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window