Financial history THE WALNUT TREE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 283283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.14k £253 £1.06k £2.84k £1.81k
Total expenditure £939 £575 £835 £2.68k £2.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A