Bristol Foster Carers Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social functions for the use of Foster Carers and the young people they look after.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 29 September 1981: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 July 2011: Re-registered
- ASSOCIATION OF FOSTER CARERS(AVON) (Previous name)
- AVON FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- AVONSIDE FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Pennington-Field | Chair | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Lily Morgan Georgina Lily Morgan | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Frances Gueye | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Tina Harrison | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £6.35k | £29.29k | £31.80k | £22.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.24k | £3.19k | £30.46k | £27.28k | £18.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | £9.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST MAY 1981 as amended on 08 Jan 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTITUTE CARE, IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF FOSTER PARENTS. CO-OPERATING AND ASSISTING WITH THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Cecil Avenue
BRISTOL
BS5 7SD
- Phone:
- 07545122504
- Email:
- markgeorge2016@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window