STERN-BRYAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsorship of a UK journalist to work in USA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 September 1981: Standard registration
- STERN-BRYAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- THE LAURENCE STERN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Duncan | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mann Plitt | Trustee | 21 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24 | £1.01k | £25.00k | £81 | £574 | |
|
Total expenditure | £93 | £0 | £0 | £1.59k | £2.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JUNE 1981 as amended on 09 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ART OF PROFESSION OF JOURNALISM INCLUDING THE AWARD OF A FELLOWSHIP TO PERSONS ENGAGED IN JOURNALISM IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND TO UNDERTAKE OR EXECUTE ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE TRUSTS OR ACTIVITIES AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A NORTH PARADE
BANBURY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6LX
OX2 6LX
- Phone:
- 01865513816
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window