THE PLUMBERS MUSEUM AND WORKSHOP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 October 1981: Standard registration
- 18 December 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 December 2008: Funds transferred to 1120568 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF PUMBERS' PLUMBING MUSEUM...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £1.80k | £9.38k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £2.27k | £1.65k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 03 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 03 December 2008 | 126 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 26 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 14 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 07 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH JULY 1981
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COLLECTION AND EXHIBITION OF PLUMBING TOOLS AND ARTEFACTS AND DOCUMENTS AND THE PLUMBING CRAFT AT THE MUSEUM SITE AT WEALD AND DOWNLAND OPEN AIR MUSEUM AT SINGLETON AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THE EQUIPMENT MAINTENANCE REPAIR INSURANCE RECONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL UPKEEP OF THE SAID EXHIBITION AND THE PAYMENT OF ALL OUTGOINGS IN CONNECTION THEREWITH AND GENERAL EXPENSES. (B) GENERALLY THE ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY EDUCATIONAL OBJECT NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING WHICH MAY COMMEND ITSELF TO THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window