Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTHEND TAXI DRIVERS FUND FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN

Charity Number: 283348
Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 627 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 627 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1357 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1357 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days