THE OUTSIDERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A social and peer support network for people with physical and social disabilities. We run the Sex and Disability Helpline, the Sexual Health and Disability Alliance, and provide resources on sex and disability. We campaign for people with disabilities to be accepted as sexual partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 16 October 1981: Standard registration
- OUTSIDERS TRUST (Working name)
- THE SOCIAL HABILITATION AND INTEGRATION TRUST FOR DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Claire de Than | Chair | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Payne | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Reginald Major | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Henry Burton | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.60k | £13.46k | £7.65k | £17.37k | £4.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.38k | £14.79k | £777 | £6.06k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH AUGUST 1981
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF THOSE DISABLED, WHETHER BY BIRTH, ACCIDENT, DISEASE OR OTHERWISE, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO THEIR SEXUAL AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIP PROBLEMS. 2. TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO SUCH PROBLEMS AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Vernon Road
LONDON
E17 7JX
- Phone:
- 07734649977
- Email:
- Members@outsiders.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window