S K CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283406
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust is established to further those purposes both in the United Kingdom and abroad recognised as charitable by English Law and in furtherance of Orthodox Judaism, to advance education and religion in accordance with Jewish faith and to give philanthropic aid to the Jewish needy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £217,189
Total expenditure: £271,676

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID KATZ Trustee
THE MK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH KATZ Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £192.25k £356.91k £159.12k £256.56k £217.19k
Total expenditure £129.76k £252.59k £252.53k £317.73k £271.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 May 2025 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 02 May 2025 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 July 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 July 2023 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 September 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 September 2022 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 15 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 ASHTEAD ROAD
LONDON
E5 9BJ
Phone:
01617981660
Website:

No information available