HATFIELD AND DISTRICT MUSIC FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Festival is held each year over two weekends and provides an opportunity for musicians of all ages and abilities perform in public and to have their performances professionally adjudicated. There is a competitive element but candidates can take advantage of the 'non competitive' option and have an unmarked assessment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 November 1981: Standard registration
- 01 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1147891 HATFIELD HOUSE CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £3.98k | £3.88k | £4.71k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | £4.47k | £3.90k | £4.33k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 16 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 1996, 9 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC, IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window