Financial history THE BANCROFT PLAYERS

Charity number: 283439
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £87.40k £103.91k £87.57k £145.17k £143.79k
Total expenditure £50.22k £45.94k £68.41k £170.06k £164.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £65.41k £16.00k N/A N/A