Trustees THE BANCROFT PLAYERS

Charity Number: 283439
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elliott James Peter Lawrence Bunker Chair 21 July 2022
None on record
Amy Laura Walker Trustee 03 November 2024
None on record
Claudia Jane O'Connell Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
Nicola Jayne Pope Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Matthew Gray Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Mark Richard Weatherbed Trustee 03 September 2021
THE QUEEN MOTHER THEATRE
Recently registered
VIVIEN JANE KERR Trustee 14 June 2018
THE QUEEN MOTHER THEATRE
Recently registered
CHRIS LANE Trustee
None on record
RORY WILLIAM REYNOLDS Trustee
None on record