NORTH LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community orchestra playing at least three classical music concerts a year, bringing classical music to the North London community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 28 October 1981: Standard registration
- NLSO (Working name)
- HARINGEY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Stockman | Chair | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raissa Harvey | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ryle | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYSANDER TENNANT | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline Jane Soresby | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC JAMES WELLS | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENISE BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA JANE WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.79k | £15.26k | £5.83k | £20.10k | £27.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.30k | £13.82k | £3.77k | £22.37k | £23.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JUNE 1981, AS AMENDED ON 6 MARCH 1995.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Rectory Gardens
LONDON
N8 7PJ
- Phone:
- 020 8341 6777
- Email:
- secretary@nlso.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window