Governing document CCGS FRIENDS
Charity Number: 283471

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/05/1981 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE CHATHAM AND CLARENDON GRAMMAR SCHOOL FEDERATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE FEDERATION (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.