Accounts and annual returns DRAYTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 283480
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 19 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 17 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 10 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required