Financial history THE LORD WHISKY SANCTUARY FUND

Charity number: 283483
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.85m £552.59k £520.40k £935.04k £757.90k
Total expenditure £725.11k £761.85k £785.52k £892.15k £1.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.63m £341.36k £245.36k £589.51k £296.10k
Income - Other trading activities £49.02k £22.95k £32.31k £42.66k £40.52k
Income - Charitable activities £144.30k £149.99k £206.00k £279.43k £381.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.54k £20.68k £20.89k £23.44k £40.25k
Income - Other £0 £17.61k £15.84k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.57m £254.96k £178.13k £452.89k £199.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £484.62k £542.60k £563.06k £621.68k £767.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.86k £3.42k £3.17k £2.97k £4.08k
Expenditure - Governance £177.96k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £236.63k £215.84k £219.29k £267.51k £302.80k