THE LORD WHISKY SANCTUARY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity continues to take in animals whose owners can no longer look after them. These animals, where possible, are found homes and those with behaviour problems or needing medical care are given sanctuary for the rest of their lives if needed. Two veterinary clinics in fixed premises, and one in a mobile surgery, are being run to enable those people on low income to have their pets treated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£757,896
Donations and legacies | £296.10k | |
Charitable activities | £381.03k | |
Other trading activities | £40.52k | |
Investments | £40.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,074,731
Raising funds | £4.08k | |
Charitable activities | £767.85k | |
Other | £302.80k |
£12,284 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £306.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £767.85k |
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE ANNE BEVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Helen Teresa Painter | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Michael Painter | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cynthia Elizabeth Pidoux | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Newman | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROY BEVIS | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY WALKINSHAW | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PIDOUX | Trustee | 29 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85m | £552.59k | £520.40k | £935.04k | £757.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £725.11k | £761.85k | £785.52k | £892.15k | £1.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.63m | £341.36k | £245.36k | £589.51k | £296.10k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £49.02k | £22.95k | £32.31k | £42.66k | £40.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £144.30k | £149.99k | £206.00k | £279.43k | £381.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.54k | £20.68k | £20.89k | £23.44k | £40.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £17.61k | £15.84k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.57m | £254.96k | £178.13k | £452.89k | £199.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £484.62k | £542.60k | £563.06k | £621.68k | £767.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.86k | £3.42k | £3.17k | £2.97k | £4.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £177.96k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £236.63k | £215.84k | £219.29k | £267.51k | £302.80k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £690.06k | £675.26k | £663.99k | £842.46k | £844.87k | |
|
Long-term investments | £320.74k | £266.12k | £354.63k | £308.89k | £321.53k | |
|
Other assets | £2.35m | £2.17m | £1.86m | £1.82m | £1.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £186.45k | £198.61k | £140.86k | £236.58k | £224.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 October 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2023
(These accounts |
27 October 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2024 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 June 2024 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH AUGUST 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SHELTER, VETERINARY TREATMENT AND BY FINDING PERMANENT HOMES FOR SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LORD WHISKY SANCTUARY
PARK HOUSE
STELLING MINNIS
CANTERBURY
CT4 6AN
- Phone:
- 01303862622
- Email:
- lord.whisky@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
lordwhisky.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window