LUTON CHRISTIAN BOOK CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To propogate Christian knowledge and understanding through the display and sale to the public of Bibles, evangelical Christian literature, music and other Christian resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 19 January 1982: Standard registration
- 22 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LCBC (Working name)
- HIGHTOWN CHRISTIAN BOOKS (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.70k | £49.40k | £62.23k | £69.90k | £59.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.92k | £44.82k | £61.97k | £87.49k | £85.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.41k | £7.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
PROPAGATION OF CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE BY MEANS OF DISPLAY AND SALE TO THE PUBLIC OF BIBLES, EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN LITERATURE, RECORDS, TAPES AND OTHER BOOKS AND MATERIALS AND EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN TEACHING AIDS, AND FOR THE POPAGATION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELICAL TRUTH.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND BEDFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window