Financial history THE HARLOW CAMPUS OF MEMORIAL UNIVERSITY OF NEWFOUNDLAND SCHOLARSHIP AND BURSARY TRUST

Charity number: 283561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.32k £3.49k £3.36k £8.57k £7.18k
Total expenditure £9.90k £738 £0 £13.50k £6.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A