SILVER CIRCLE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving assistance to members by taking them weekly to the local shop and regularly to the nearby town in hired community transport. Additional social activities arranged throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 16 April 1982: Standard registration
- 26 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 26 March 2021: Funds transferred to 1074755 TENDRING COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
- 26 March 2021: Funds transferred to 274134 FRINTON-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- 26 March 2021: Funds transferred to 283473 VOLUNTEER BUREAU FOR TENDRING
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £3.01k | £2.82k | £2.30k | £864 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £2.87k | £2.93k | £2.51k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 21 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 27 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF MEMBERS OVER SIXTY YEARS OF AGE BY PROVIDING SHOPPING TRIPS AND SOCIAL EVENTS THEREBY ENHANCING THEIR INDEPENDENCE AND QUALITY OF LIFE WITHIN THE AREAS OF FRINTON-ON-SEA AND WALTON-ON-THE-NAZE
Area of benefit
FRINTON-ON-SEA AND WALTON-ON-THE-NAZE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window