THE FRIENDS OF GREAT ST MARY'S CHURCH SAWBRIDGEWORTH

Charity number: 283639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The "Friends" campaign to raise funds for the preservation, restoration and improvement of the fabric of the Parish Church of Great St. Mary's in Sawbridgeworth and the provision of articles for use in worship there.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £3,032
Total expenditure: £2,166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 January 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF GREAT ST MARYS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Menzies Trustee 25 March 2015
None on record
MARY ELIZABETH SHIPMAN Trustee
None on record
EILEEN CLARICE GRIFFITHS Trustee
None on record
GEORGINA KING Trustee
None on record
MRS DI KITSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.24k £4.03k £2.21k £2.28k £3.03k
Total expenditure £861 £997 £11.68k £733 £2.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 March 2022 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
58 Windhill
Bishop's Stortford
CM23 2NH
Phone:
07702030106