DEVELOPMENT STUDIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance knowledge of the alternative processes and methods of socio-economic change, which studies are commonly referred to as development studies. The focus of study is developing countries and countries in transition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 1981: Standard registration
- D S A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ibrahim Nateel | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Louise Mcloughlin | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kamna Patel | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Touseef Yousuf Mir | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Chebet Ronoh | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Mohammad Jahangir Alam Chowdhury | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zechariahs Benapugha Owutuamor | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Emma Mawdsley | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Eyob Balcha Gebremariam | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Indrajit Roy | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Prof Michael Jennings | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annalisa Prizzon | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jonathan Fisher | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Peter Taylor | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Shailaja Fennell | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Tuesday Onkeo Gichuki | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Uma Kambhampati | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Laura Emma Camfield | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.53k | £90.50k | £113.43k | £129.03k | £204.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.23k | £102.45k | £127.64k | £127.30k | £202.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/09/1978 AS AMENDED ON 11/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2015 as amended on 30 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE OF THE ALTERNATIVE PROCESSES AND METHODS OF SOCIO-ECONOMIC CHANGE, WHICH STUDIES ARE COMMONLY REFERRED TO AS DEVELOPMENT STUDIES, THROUGH INTER-DISCIPLINARY STUDIES, MEETINGS CONFERENCES, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ABOUT RESEARCH RESULTS, OPERATION AND PRACTICE, COURSE CURRICULA, AND TRAINING SCHEMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 23 Linton Road
HOVE
BN3 5HF
- Phone:
- 07866425805
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window