ST WILFRID'S HOSPICE (EASTBOURNE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Wilfrid's Hospice is a local charity providing skilled and compassionate care and treatment for all patients with complex needs as they near end of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,549,493
Donations and legacies | £4.26m | |
Charitable activities | £2.29m | |
Other trading activities | £1.78m | |
Investments | £204.01k | |
Other | £19.50k |
Total expenditure:
£10,647,225
Raising funds | £1.48m | |
Charitable activities | £7.80m | |
Other | £1.36m |
£165,309 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £592,424 from 2 government contract(s) and £1,697,672 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.84m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.80m |
People

251 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
537 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- ST WILFORD'S HOSPICE (EASTBOURNE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- ST WILFRID'S HOSPICE (EASTBOURNE) LTD (Previous name)
- ST WILFRID'S HOSPICE (EASTBOURNE)TRADING COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Shaun O'Leary | Chair | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Robert Henry Smith | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Holdsworth | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Hobson | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giles Dominic Humphrey Meyer | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Hodson Barnes | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN ADAMS | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE BUTLER | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.33m | £10.71m | £8.92m | £9.69m | £8.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.89m | £8.06m | £8.30m | £9.44m | £10.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £534.81k | £581.84k | £592.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £112.50k | £3.75m | £2.13m | £1.72m | £1.70m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.66m | £5.54m | £4.67m | £5.65m | £4.26m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.44m | £798.52k | £1.50m | £1.61m | £1.78m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.15m | £4.20m | £2.67m | £2.23m | £2.29m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £56.88k | £34.22k | £60.76k | £138.17k | £204.01k | |
|
Income - Other | £24.98k | £138.11k | £21.77k | £56.33k | £19.50k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.81m | £3.94m | £2.89m | £3.85m | £2.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.03m | £6.22m | £6.36m | £7.05m | £7.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £882.83k | £959.28k | £979.11k | £1.24m | £1.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.91k | £17.48k | £17.48k | £26.16k | £27.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £11.16k | £23.75k | £25.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £977.55k | £877.39k | £969.00k | £1.15m | £1.36m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.13m | £10.03m | £9.82m | £9.51m | £9.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £753.28k | £753.28k | £935.00k | £940.00k | £940.00k | |
|
Other assets | £6.96m | £9.70m | £10.61m | £10.99m | £8.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.58m | £1.58m | £1.59m | £1.56m | £630.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2014 as amended on 26 Sep 2017 as amended on 04 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Wilfrids Hospice Ltd
1 Broadwater Way
EASTBOURNE
BN22 9PZ
- Phone:
- 01323434200
- Email:
- hospice@stwhospice.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window