Accounts and annual returns NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 283696
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 March 2025 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required