Financial history NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 283696
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023
Total gross income £20.27k £15.96k £4.51k £14.69k £21.47k
Total expenditure £20.27k £16.39k £9.20k £18.98k £17.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A