NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop young peoples awareness and skills in agriculture, country life, home crafts and general related topics. Provide and promote the facilities for recreation and other leisure time activities which will assist in their development and individual responsibilities so that they may grow to full maturity as individual and members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 24 July 1984: Standard registration
- NBYFC (Working name)
- NORTH BEDS YFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Poppy O'Driscoll | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jemma Slaughter | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bates | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.27k | £15.96k | £4.51k | £14.69k | £21.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.27k | £16.39k | £9.20k | £18.98k | £17.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2025 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITEIS FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRTUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
College Cottage
Bedford Road
Pertenhall
BEDFORD
MK44 2AZ
- Phone:
- 0000000000000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window