Financial history THE BRISTOL BRUNEL ACADEMY

Charity Number: 283705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £771 £12 £545 £2.11k £2.63k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A