WELLINGBOROUGH VOLUNTEER BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 July 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 December 1981: Standard registration
- 10 October 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 October 2008: Funds transferred to 1113854 SHIRE COMMUNITY SERVICES LTD
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 14/07/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.29k | £282.03k | £369.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.61k | £257.99k | £348.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 14 July 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 06 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 10 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH NOVEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE WELLINGBOROUGH AREA; AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF, OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
WELLINGBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window