CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of the church are to see to the uplifting of the Christian religion through regular worshipp and to cater for the spiritual well being of all its members and guests by means of preaching the good news through regular sermons and seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 20 November 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bode Ishola-George | Chair | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Serrano | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ogunboye | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olubunmi Ogunboye | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Tinubu | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Akeke | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MAGBAGBEOLA | Trustee | 15 January 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREW FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REUBEN AZAMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.65k | £36.90k | £41.83k | £64.93k | £80.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.45k | £30.04k | £45.65k | £68.60k | £88.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2024 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2024 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS.2) TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.3) TO ADVANCE THE SPIRITUAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Julius Nyerere Close
LONDON
N1 0JT
- Phone:
- 07983497179
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window