RAPTOR RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raptor Rescue is dedicated to ensuring that all sick or injured birds of prey and owls are cared for by qualified persons and wherever possible, successfully released back into the wild.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 December 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM ERNEST ROBBINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Thomson | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Rubin | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
OSCAR GODSON | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ROYLE | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.76k | £14.18k | £2.46k | £2.72k | £2.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.25k | £8.82k | £20.50k | £6.32k | £13.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 21ST OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED 27TH OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE OF WOUNDED AND SICK RAPTORS AND TO RETURN TO THE WILD THOSE WHICH ARE FULLY CURED. (SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Cockcroft Avenue
COVENTRY
CV2 3QP
- Phone:
- 02476637830
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
raptorrescue.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window