LA LECHE LEAGUE GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LLLGB is a voluntary organisation dedicated to providing education, information, support, and encouragement to women who want to breastfeed. Our mission is to help mothers to breastfeed through mother-to-mother support, encouragement, information and education, and to promote a better understanding, of breastfeeding as an important element in the healthy development of the baby and the mother
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,153 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
195 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 February 1982: Standard registration
- L L L - G B (Working name)
- LA LECHE LEAGUE (GREAT BRITAIN) (Working name)
- LA LECHE LEAGUE GREAT BRITAIN (Working name)
- LA LECHE LEAGUE GREAT BRITIAN (Working name)
- LA LECHE LEAGUE (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Breen | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sheldon | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Emilia Bertolo-Pardo | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Yasnova | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL O'LEARY | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Heather Birt | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rae Lowe | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fletcher | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitriona Martin | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Joyce | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Baghdadi | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Russ | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.09k | £115.74k | £128.67k | £117.16k | £148.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.31k | £78.35k | £96.67k | £127.92k | £159.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.46k | £23.28k | £27.58k | N/A | £18.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2014 as amended on 20 May 2020 as amended on 06 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND PSYCOLOGICAL HEALTH OF MOTHERS AND CHILDREN THROUGH EDUCATION IN THE TECHNIQUE OF BREASTFEEDING, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ESPECIALLY THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE CARE OF CHILDREN IN THE HEALTH BENEFITS BOTH IMMEDIATE AND LONG-TERM OF BREASTFEEDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
La Leche League GB Charlotte House
The Wyvern Business Park
Stanier Way
DE21 6BF
- Phone:
- 0345 1202918
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window