BATE AND HULLCOOP FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to Schools for the furthering of the education of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 December 1981: Standard registration
- 14 January 2022: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 12 February 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 04 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SHEME OF 5TH AUGUST 1981
Charitable objects
PROVIDING FOR THE SHIPLAKE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED AT THE SCHOOL BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window