TAUNTON HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing an entirely volunteer run & managed FM Community Radio Station to the care and wider general communities within Taunton Deane boundary, and to anyone outside of the reach of the FM broadcast via the internet and dedicated smartphone app, including patients cared for within all hospitals in Somerset, to ease isolation, inform on important topics and provide general entertainment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 December 1981: Standard registration
- APPLE AM (Working name)
- APPLE FM (Working name)
- THR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Hodgson-Purves | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greg Perkins | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wareing | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14k | £1.62k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £938 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.37k | £2.33k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN THE AREA BOUNDED BY THE SOMERSET AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA BOUNDED BY THE SOMERSET AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Studio
Musgrove Park
Taunton
Somerset
TA1 5DA
- Phone:
- 01823288970
- Email:
- info@applefm.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window