THE LONDON MARATHON CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The London Marathon Charitable Trust aims to inspire physical activity and does so by awarding grants to help make available facilities and other opportunities for physical activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£8,002,468
Donations and legacies | £300.95k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £966.57k | |
Other | £6.73m |
Total expenditure:
£50,849,609
Raising funds | £42.34m | |
Charitable activities | £8.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £42.34m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.51m |
People

11 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 1982: Standard registration
- London Marathon Foundation (Working name)
- LONDON MARATHON TRUST (Working name)
- THE LONDON MARATHON (Working name)
- THE LONDON MARATHON LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR RODNEY WALKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Baroness Natalie Jessica Evans of Bowes Park | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Nizam Uddin | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Denise Elizabeth Stephenson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Shrina Shah | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Aida Anna Cable | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
John Tennent | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Mete Coban | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Yogesh Patel | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Terry Duddy | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Samantha Orde | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dawn Austwick | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN PETER PASCOE MBE | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES MADDOCK JOHNSTON | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.17m | £23.37m | £35.75m | £42.88m | £50.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.16m | £26.41m | £30.27m | £39.58m | £50.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £656.73k | £1.60m | £313.39k | £301.05k | £300.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £47.26m | £21.57m | £35.15m | £42.12m | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £249.47k | £194.09k | £288.84k | £463.20k | £966.57k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.73m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.26m | £5.19m | £1.53m | £4.56m | £8.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £38.90m | £21.22m | £28.75m | £35.02m | £42.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.28k | £31.06k | £31.04k | £19.63k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £11.59m | £4.43m | £819.78k | £3.71m | £8.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £81.84k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.42m | £21.94m | £21.93m | £23.23m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.53m | £6.43m | £11.62m | £11.35m | £9.81m | |
|
Other assets | £52.34m | £38.07m | £34.81m | £34.15m | £11.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £63.50m | £57.92m | £54.15m | £52.74m | £9.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/07/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 MAY 2021 as amended on 08 Jun 2022 as amended on 17 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN AMATEUR SPORT AND HEALTHY PHYSICAL RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THOSE CITIES OR COUNTIES WHERE LMEL (OR SUCH OTHER SUBSIDIARIES OF THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME) HOLDS EVENTS AND IN SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE, PROMOTE, IMPROVE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING, IMPROVING OR PROMOTING: A) PUBLIC FACILITIES, AMENITIES, EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES FOR HEALTHY PHYSICAL RECREATION AND PLAY; B) FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATIONAL SPORTING OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES; C) THE IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN SPORT, PLAY AND HEALTHY PHYSICAL RECREATION; D) VOLUNTEERING IN SPORT AND HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; AND E) EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SPORTS COACHES AND SPORTS VOLUNTEERS. 2.2 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2.3 FOR THE PURPOSE OF THESE ARTICLES, ‘SPORT’ SHALL MEAN ANY SPORT OR GAME WHICH PROMOTES HEALTH THROUGH PHYSICAL EXERTION.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marathon House
190 Great Dover Street
LONDON
SE1 4YB
- Phone:
- 02079020215
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window